WA HB1723 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Effective date 6/7/2018***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Effective date 6/7/2018***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the presumption of occupational disease for certain employees at the United States department of energy Hanford site.
Title
Creating the presumption of occupational disease for certain employees at the United States department of energy Hanford site.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018***. |
2018-03-07 | House | Chapter 9, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 74; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-02-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |