WA HB1675 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the adoption process.
Title
Improving the adoption process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-11 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |