WA HB1164 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the responsible management of appliances containing harmful gases and other materials.
Title
Providing for the responsible management of appliances containing harmful gases and other materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 65 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |