WA HB1044 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing capital financial assistance to small school districts with demonstrated funding challenges.
Title
Providing capital financial assistance to small school districts with demonstrated funding challenges.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel McEntire [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Travis Couture [R] | Rep. Bryan Sandlin [R] |
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-01-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2023-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate adheres to its position. |
2023-04-20 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate for a conference. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. |
2023-04-14 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-20 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-12-16 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 525 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 525 | 159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |