WA HB1031 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding participation in college in the high school programs.
Title
Expanding participation in college in the high school programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-28 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-02 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-02 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |