VT H0611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Older Vermonters Act
Title
An act relating to the Older Vermonters Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020 |
2020-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor on October 5, 2020 |
2020-09-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on September 30, 2020 |
2020-09-23 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-09-23 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-23 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-09-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-06-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-06-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-16 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to |
2020-06-16 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as offered by Rep. Noyes of Wolcott |
2020-06-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wood of Waterbury, Noyes of Wolcott, Brumsted of Shelburne, Gregoire of Fairfield, Haas of Rochester, McFaun of Barre Town, Nicoll of Ludlow, Pajala of Londonderry, Pugh of South Burlington, Redmond of Essex, and Rosenquist of Georgia agreed to |
2020-06-16 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury reported for the committee on Human Services |
2020-06-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-20 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to. |
2020-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/13/2020 |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |