VT H0539 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Stowe and to the merger of the Town and the Stowe Fire District No. 3
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Stowe and to the merger of the Town and the Stowe Fire District No. 3
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-04-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-12 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-04-12 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |