VA SJR38 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Amanda L. Newins.
Title
Commending Amanda L. Newins.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER) |
2024-01-22 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-01-19 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-01-19 | House | Received |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Presented 24101770D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR185 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ185ER)