VA SB988 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Commission on Health Care; sunset. Extends the sunset for the Joint Commission on Health Care from July 1, 2012, to July 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care, Joint Commission on; extends sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-26 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 16-N) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB988ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-26 Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-26 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 16-N)
2011-02-26 House: Conference report agreed to by House (78-Y 16-N)
2011-02-24 Senate: Senators: Puller, Edwards, Blevins
2011-02-24 Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate
2011-02-24 House: Delegates: Brink, Stolle, O'Bannon
2011-02-24 House: Conferees appointed by House
2011-02-24 Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-24 House: House requested conference committee
2011-02-24 House: House insisted on substitute
2011-02-23 Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
2011-02-23 Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-23 Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
2011-02-22 House: Passed House with substitute (86-Y 11-N)
2011-02-22 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB988H1
2011-02-22 House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105475D-H1
2011-02-22 House: Read third time
2011-02-21 House: Read second time
2011-02-17 House: Committee substitute printed 11105475D-H1
2011-02-17 House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Referred to Committee on Rules
2011-02-07 House: Read first time
2011-02-07 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-02 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2011-01-31 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2011-01-28 Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2011-01-14 Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1
2011-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules
2011-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101045D

Same As/Similar To

HB2303 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+sum+SB988
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+SB988+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+SB988H1+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+SB988ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+CHAP0607+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+S10V0018+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0142SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0176SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+H20V0087+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+HV1246+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0642SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0659SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0660SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0723SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0814SB0988+SB0988
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+HV1518+SB0988

Bill Comments

feedback