VA SB945 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; services for individuals with developmental disabilities; financial flexibility; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to take steps to amend the Family and Individual Supports, Community Living, and Building Independence waivers to provide greater financial flexibility to individuals with developmental disabilities who are receiving waiver services. The bill requires the Department to report on its progress to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2023.
Title
Individuals with developmental disabilities; financial flexibility, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB945ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103672D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1963 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation