VA SB811 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Filing fraudulent liens or encumbrances against the property of another; penalty. Provides that any person who maliciously files a fraudulent lien or encumbrance in a public record against the real or personal property of another, knowing that such lien or encumbrance is false, is guilty of a Class 5 felony.
Title
False lien or encumbrance; filing against real or personal property of another, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB811ER) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 13105048D-H1 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB811H1 |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13105048D-H1 |
2013-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-02-12 | House | Incorporates SB1314 |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Substitute bill reprinted 13105048D-H1 |
2013-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 13105048D-H1 |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB811S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104320D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Incorporates SB1113 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104320D-S1 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100964D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Similar To) 2013-01-21 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Subjects
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax