VA SB80 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Requires 2/3 members present
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Requires 2/3 members present
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Decreasing probation period; criteria for mandatory reduction; report. Establishes criteria for which a defendant's supervised probation period shall be reduced, including completing qualifying educational activities, maintaining verifiable employment, and complying with or completing any state-certified or state-approved mental health or substance abuse treatment program. The bill provides that a court may decrease a defendant's probation period if warranted by the defendant's conduct and in the interests of justice and may do so without a hearing. The bill also directs the Department of Corrections to meet with relevant stakeholders and provide to the General Assembly by November 1, 2024, a report regarding certain probation practices. The provisions of the bill, other than the requirement that the Department submit a report to the General Assembly, are subject to reenactment by the 2025 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Decreasing probation period; establishes criteria for mandatory reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 40-N) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 40-N) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB80ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (53-Y 43-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 24109071D-S3 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Carr, Willett, Wyatt |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Carr, Willet, Wyatt |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Williams Graves, McDougle |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 40-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (56-Y 40-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB80H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108394D-H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108394D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB80S2 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107384D-S2 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24106458D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107384D-S2 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106458D-S1 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104289D |
Same As/Similar To
HB457 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 32.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2409.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |