VA SB695 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Hampton; candidacy of councilmembers in mayoral election. Bars any City of Hampton mayoral candidate from simultaneously running for a place on the Hampton city council and establishes a procedure for the resignation of any serving councilmember not elected on the same election cycle as the mayor who wishes to run for mayor. The bill establishes a deadline, effective date, and other parameters for the resignation of a serving councilmember and provides for the filling of the remaining term of office of a councilmember who has resigned to become a candidate in a mayoral election.
Title
Hampton, City of; amending charter, candidacy of councilmembers in mayoral election.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB695ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) |
2014-11-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-11-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100863D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2025 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)