VA SB628 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB628
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Public School Trades Incentive Fund (the Fund) and the Public School Trades Incentive Program (the Program) for the purpose of providing grants on a competitive basis from the Fund to any school board that seeks to (i) restore high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials or (ii) create or restore middle school programs that encourage and recruit students to participate in high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials. The bill requires the Department of Education to administer the Program and to establish such rules and procedures relating to applications and awards as it deems appropriate, provided that the Department considers and gives appropriate weight to certain criteria for grantees. The bill permits any grantee to use Program funds for equipment, curriculum development, or instructor training. The bill requires each grantee to longitudinally track students who complete any program for which the school board received funds in order to determine the effectiveness of the (a) new or restored middle school programs in recruiting students to participate in restored high school programs and (b) restored high school programs in matching students with high-paying jobs in the fields in which they are certified or credentialed.
Title
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; created and established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22102570D |
Same As/Similar To
SB628 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)