VA SB51 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural operations; local regulation of certain activities. Protects certain activities at agricultural operations from local regulation in the absence of substantial impacts on the public welfare and requires localities to take certain factors into account when regulating any of several activities: the conduct of agritourism activities, the sale of agricultural or silvicultural products or related items, the preparation or sale of foods that otherwise comply with state law, and other customary activities. Localities are prohibited from subjecting the listed activities to a special-use permit requirement in the absence of a substantial impact on health, safety, or public welfare and in most situations are prevented from stringently regulating the sound produced by the listed activities. The bill provides that its provisions shall not affect an entity licensed in accordance with the alcoholic beverage control laws, affect the provisions of the Right to Farm Act, alter the provisions of § 15.2-2288.3 (licensed farm wineries), or restrict the taxation authority of any locality.
Title
Agricultural operations; local regulation of certain activities, On-Farm Activities Working Group.
Sponsors
Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Linda Puller [D] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Jeffrey McWaters [R] |
Sen. William Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 153 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB51ER) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 19-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed House with amendments (75-Y 19-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB51S1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104069D-S1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104069D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102000D |
Same As/Similar To
HB268 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)