VA SB49 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Community revitalization fund; expanding use for all localities. Expands the current provisions of law allowing for the establishment of a community revitalization fund for the purpose of preventing neighborhood deterioration to apply to all localities. Currently, only the City of Richmond is authorized to establish such a fund.
Title
Community revitalization fund; expanding use for all localities.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB49ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 12-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (88-Y 12-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100699D |
Same As/Similar To
HB478 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/24)