VA SB397 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; posting of illegal gaming tip line information. Requires those legally authorized to sell Virginia lottery tickets or conduct charitable gaming, horse racing with pari-mutuel wagering, and casino gaming in the Commonwealth to post in a conspicuous place on their premises a sign that bears the toll-free telephone number and website of the illegal gaming tip line established and administered by the Office of the Gaming Enforcement Coordinator in the Department of State Police for members of the public to report concerns about, or suspected instances of, illegal gaming activities.
Title
Gaming; posting of illegal gaming tip line information.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 593 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB397ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB397S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106112D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB348 (Reeves) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106112D-S1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101320D |
Same As/Similar To
SB348 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4122.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |