VA SB382 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; collection of overpayments; limitations. Provides that collection activities for an overpayment, provided that such overpayment was not caused by fraud on the part of the claimant, shall be suspended and that the Virginia Employment Commission shall determine as uncollectable and discharge the overpayment if it remains unpaid after the earliest of the following: (i) after the expiration of five years from the last day of the benefit year in which the overpayment was made, (ii) immediately upon the death of the claimant, (iii) upon the claimant's discharge in bankruptcy occurring subsequently to the determination of payment, or (iv) at any time where the Commission finds such overpayment to be uncollectible or the recovery of such overpayment to be administratively impracticable. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Commission on Unemployment Compensation. Unemployment compensation; collection of overpayments; limitations. Provides that collection activities for an overpayment, provided that such overpayment was not caused by fraud on the part of the claimant, shall be suspended and that the Virginia Employment Commission shall determine as uncollectable and discharge the overpayment if it remains unpaid after the earliest of the following: (i) after the expiration of five years from the last day of the benefit year in which the overpayment was made, (ii) immediately upon the death of the claimant, (iii) upon the claimant's discharge in bankruptcy occurring subsequently to the determination of payment, or (iv) at any time where the Commission finds such overpayment to be uncollectible or the recovery of such overpayment to be administratively impracticable. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Commission on Unemployment Compensation.
Title
Unemployment compensation; collection of overpayments, limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 591 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB382ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment (94-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24104023D-E |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB382E |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104023D |