VA SB356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation of court-appointed counsel. Raises the limitation of fees that court-appointed counsel can receive for representation on various offenses in district and circuit courts. The bill also limits the fees charged for the cost of court-appointed counsel or public defender representation to persons determined to be indigent to an amount no greater than the amount such person would have owed if such fees had been assessed on or before June 30, 2024. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025.
Title
Court-appointed counsel; raises the limitation of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 1/1/25) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB356ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 24108973D-S3 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Reaser, Maldonado, Earley |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Perry, Salim, Stanley |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendment |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB356H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee on Courts of Justice substitute agreed to 24107778D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107778D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB356S2 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107231D-S2 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24106453D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107231D-S2 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106453D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104915D |
Same As/Similar To
HB102 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714)