VA SB296 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Dealer Board, motor vehicle dealers, and T&M vehicle dealers. Provides for more efficient operations of the Board, ensures solvency of the Motor Vehicle Transaction Recovery Fund, and reduces the number of agency regulations.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Board, motor vehicle dealers, and T&M vehicle dealers; efficiency of operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 14-N) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 695 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB296ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 14-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House (79-Y 14-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14103272D-E |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB296E |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103272D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1527.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1919 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |