VA SB1291 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1291
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Water Protection Permit; withdrawal of surface water or ground water; plans for water auditing and leak detection and repair. Requires that any application for a permit to withdraw surface water or ground water include a water auditing plan and a leak detection and repair plan that comply with regulations adopted by the State Water Control Board pursuant to the provisions of the bill. The provisions of the bill shall not become effective until 30 days after the adoption by the Board of such regulations. Virginia Water Protection Permit; withdrawal of surface water or ground water; plans for water auditing and leak detection and repair. Requires that any application for a permit to withdraw surface water or ground water include a water auditing plan and a leak detection and repair plan that comply with regulations adopted by the State Water Control Board pursuant to the provisions of the bill. The provisions of the bill shall not become effective until 30 days after the adoption by the Board of such regulations.
Title
Va. Water Protection Permit; withdrawal of surface water or ground water, plans for water auditing.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 100 (effective 7/1/21-see bill) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1291ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101997D-E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1291E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101997D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1291 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 262 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |