VA HJR507 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ507ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ507ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
National Day of the Cowboy in Virginia. Designates the fourth Saturday in July, in 2015 and in each succeeding year, as the National Day of the Cowboy in Virginia.
Title
National Day of the Cowboy; designating as fourth Saturday in July 2015, and each year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ507ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-01-28 | House | Taken up |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-11-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-11-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100697D |