VA HJR506 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; short- and long-term impact of biosolids and industrial waste; report. Requests the Virginia Institute of Marine Science and the Department of Mines, Minerals, and Energy's Division of Geology and Mineral Resources' Virginia geological survey, in consultation with the United States Geological Survey's Toxic Hydrology Regional Contamination Investigation Program, to study the short- and long-term effects of the storage and land application of industrial wastes and sewage sludge on public health, residential wells, and surface and ground water.
Title
Long-term impact of biosolids and industrial waste; Va. Institute of Marine Science & DMME to study.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2015-02-27 | House | No further action taken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Norment, McDougle, Alexander |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Ware, Knight, Lopez |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105166D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ506S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105166D-S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105166D-S1 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ506H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104107D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104107D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100632D |