VA HJR372 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending LINK, Inc.
Title
Commending LINK, Inc.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] |
Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2014-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14104989D |
2014-02-26 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104989D |