VA HJR357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Kings Dominion.
Title
Commending Kings Dominion.
Sponsors
Del. William Howell [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2014-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-21 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104789D |