VA HJR160 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-32)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ160ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-32)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ160ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Melissa A. Porfirio.
Title
Commending Melissa A. Porfirio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ160ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-05 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14104026D |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104026D |