VA HB995 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grand larceny; threshold. Increases from $500 to $1,000 the threshold amount of money taken or value of goods or chattel taken at which the crime rises from petit larceny to grand larceny. The bill increases the threshold by the same amount for the classification of certain property crimes.
Title
Grand larceny; increases threshold amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB995ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N 1-A) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB995H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106688D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB263 (Lopez) |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106688D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103373D |
Same As/Similar To
HB263 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB788 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
SB788 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 108.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 162 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 197 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |