VA HB915 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hydraulic fracturing on state-owned uplands. Requires that any permit or lease for oil or gas exploration or extraction on state-owned uplands allow the use of hydraulic fracturing.
Title
State-owned uplands; hydraulic fracturing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102956D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB915 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB915+hil |