VA HB914 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local historic districts; tax incentives. Allows a locality that establishes a local historic district to provide tax incentives for the conservation and renovation of historic structures in such district. The bill provides that such incentives may include tax rebates to the extent allowed by the Constitution of Virginia. Local historic districts; tax incentives. Allows a locality that establishes a local historic district to provide tax incentives for the conservation and renovation of historic structures in such district. The bill provides that such incentives may include tax rebates to the extent allowed by the Constitution of Virginia.
Title
Local historic district; locality that establishes district may provide tax incentive.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB914ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB914H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106171D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106171D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104717D |