VA HB819 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Summary
Continuing care retirement communities; medical assistance. Allows nursing facilities in continuing care retirement communities in Planning District 8 to participate in the Medical Assistance Program so long as (i) the nursing facility is no longer operating under an open admissions period, (ii) any patients who qualify and receive medical assistance have been residents of the community for at least three years, (iii) not more than 10 percent of the facility receives benefits at any given time, and (iv) residents who qualify for and receive medical assistance have exhausted any refundable entrance fee paid on the resident's behalf as a result of expenditures for that resident's care. This bill also allows these facilities to be exempt from certificate of public need requirements as long as no resident receives federal or state public assistance funds during an open admissions period.
Title
Nursing facilities; those in continuing care retirement communities to participate in program.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 857 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB819ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB819ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 084111404-S2 (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB819S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute from Education and Health agreed to 084111404-S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute from Finance rejected 084111404-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084111404-S2 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Education and Health | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084111404-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 084067404-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB819E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendments from Appropriations agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendments from Health, Welfare and Institutions agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084067404 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB819 |