VA HB767 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary schools; compulsory attendance policies and procedures; educational neglect defined. Revises the policies and procedures relating to addressing the nonattendance or nonenrollment of a child subject to compulsory education requirements by expanding the definition of "abused or neglected child" to include educational neglect and, therefore, requiring any teacher, attendance officer, or other person employed by such child's school, to report such neglect to the appropriate authority in accordance with pertinent law. The bill defines "educational neglect" as the failure or refusal to provide necessary education for a child who is subject to compulsory attendance in accordance with relevant law and is enrolled in a public school and has missed 10 percent or more of the academic year, including by (i) causing or allowing the child to become chronically absent, defined as any student who has missed 10 percent or more of the academic year for any reason, including excused and unexcused absences, or (ii) failing or refusing to enroll a child in any school who is not otherwise exempt from school attendance if (a) such failure or refusal to enroll continues after the school notifies and institutes proceedings against the parent and (b) the time elapsed between the institution of proceedings and the continued noncompliance to date exceeds 10 percent of the academic year.
Title
Public elementary and secondary schools; compulsory attendance policies and procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104640D |
Same As/Similar To
SB619 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 261 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 262 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 267 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |