VA HB763 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; notification; physical therapy. Requires the Board of Health to adopt regulations requiring hospitals to establish protocols to ensure that any patient scheduled to receive an elective surgical procedure for which the patient can reasonably be expected to require outpatient physical therapy as a follow-up treatment after discharge is informed that he (i) is expected to require outpatient physical therapy as a follow-up treatment and (ii) will be required to select a physical therapy provider prior to being discharged from the hospital.
Title
Hospitals; notification to patient of outpatient physical therapy following discharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 714 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB763ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB763H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106871D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106871D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101523D |