VA HB755 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil penalties for certain local property violations; industrial and commercial areas. Allows localities by ordinance to charge enhanced civil penalties for certain local property violations on property that is zoned or utilized for industrial or commercial purposes.
Title
Industrial and commercial areas; civil penalties for certain local property violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 731 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB755ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 17-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102129D |