VA HB682 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Bristol. Amends the City of Bristol's charter to provide for five voting precincts rather than four. The bill also replaces references to the personnel department with "human resources department" and makes changes related to the assignment of powers and duties.
Title
Bristol, City of; amending charter, increases voting precincts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB682ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101453D |
Same As/Similar To
SB618 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)