VA HB65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bedford; references to the former City of Bedford. Removes references to the former City of Bedford in certain sections of the Code. Bedford reverted to town status in 2013.
Title
Bedford; references to the former city of Bedford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB65ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100724D |
Same As/Similar To
SB769 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 4903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |