VA HB621 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rabies regulation and control; penalty. Clarifies the procedures and responsibilities among the Department of Health, localities, and other entities to prevent and control rabies. This bill clarifies that all dogs and cats over the age of four months must be vaccinated, provides that rabies certificates shall be issued to the owner of the animal vaccinated and that the veterinarian shall keep a copy of the certificate in his own files, clarifies the authority to access rabies certificates maintained at veterinary hospitals, addresses recordkeeping standards for rabies clinics, and clarifies the authority of the local health director in regard to a rabies exposure. The bill requires the local health director and the governing body of the locality to adopt a plan to control and respond to the risk of rabies.
Title
Rabies; clarifies procedures and responsibilities to prevent and control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB621ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB621ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB621H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104319D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104319D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103437D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 313.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6522 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6562 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3812 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |