VA HB612 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic counseling; licensure. Provides that no person shall practice or hold himself out as practicing genetic counseling without a valid, unrevoked license as a genetic counselor from the Board of Medicine. The bill establishes requirements and a process for licensure as a genetic counselor, sets forth exemptions from the requirements for a license, and establishes the Advisory Board on Genetic Counseling.
Title
Genetic counseling; regulation of practice, licensure, advisory board established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 11-N) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 11-N) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010) | |
2014-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB612ER) |
2014-02-12 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 11-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 11-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB612H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14103616D-H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103616D-H1 |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101520D |
Same As/Similar To
SB330 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)