VA HB586 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan; eligibility. Eliminates the requirement that an individual under the age of 19 must have been without health insurance for at least four months or must meet the requirements set forth in the Virginia Plan for Title XXI of the Social Security Act (Children's Health Insurance Program) to be eligible for assistance under the Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan. The bill requires regulations to be promulgated within 280 days of enactment and is identical to
Title
Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan; eligibility for assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2014-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB586ER) |
2014-02-12 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 14101248D-E |
2014-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB586E |
2014-01-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101248D |