VA HB485 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative subpoena for electronic communication service or remote computing service records; abduction and prostitution offenses. Adds certain abduction and prostitution offenses to the list of crimes for which attorneys for the Commonwealth have the authority to issue administrative subpoenas to obtain records and other information from electronic communication service and remote computing service providers if relevant to a legitimate law-enforcement investigation.
Title
Abduction and prostitution offenses; administrative subpoena for electronic communication service.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Barbara Comstock [R] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. James Leftwich [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 166 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB485ER) |
2014-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102847D |