VA HB442 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan. Requires a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent if the exact amount of rent owed is less than or equal to one month's rent plus any late charges contracted for in the rental agreement and as provided by law, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the exact amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the exact amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement. The bill prohibits the landlord from charging any additional late fees during the payment plan period in connection with the unpaid rental amount for which the tenant entered into the payment plan so long as the tenant makes timely payments in accordance with the terms of the payment plan. The bill also outlines the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the exact amount due and owed or enter into a payment plan within five days of receiving notice or if a tenant enters into a payment plan and after such plan becomes effective fails to pay rent when due or fails to make a payment under the terms of the agreed-upon payment plan. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan. Requires a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent if the exact amount of rent owed is less than or equal to one month's rent plus any late charges contracted for in the rental agreement and as provided by law, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the exact amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the exact amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement. The bill prohibits the landlord from charging any additional late fees during the payment plan period in connection with the unpaid rental amount for which the tenant entered into the payment plan so long as the tenant makes timely payments in accordance with the terms of the payment plan. The bill also outlines the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the exact amount due and owed or enter into a payment plan within five days of receiving notice or if a tenant enters into a payment plan and after such plan becomes effective fails to pay rent when due or fails to make a payment under the terms of the agreed-upon payment plan.
Title
Va. Residential Landlord & Tenant Act; landlord remedies, noncompliance with rental agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB442ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 24100052D-E |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB442E |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100052D |