VA HB27 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship foster care; alternative living arrangements; Parental Child Safety Placement Program established. Establishes the Parental Child Safety Placement Program to promote and support placements of children with relatives by local boards of social services in order to avoid foster care. The bill establishes the requirements for a parental child safety placement agreement, the procedure for assessing a proposed caregiver, and the process for terminating the placement.
Title
Kinship foster care; placement of child with foster parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective - see bill) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB27ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB27H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106095D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106095D-H1 |
2024-01-23 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2023-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103039D |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)