VA HB2285 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative fuels taxes. Establishes beginning January 1, 2014, alternative fuels tax rates for biodiesel fuel, liquefied natural gas, liquefied petroleum gas, methanol, compressed natural gas, hydrogen, and electricity used in operating a highway vehicle.
Title
Alternative fuels; establishes tax rate for biodiesel fuel, etc., used in operating highway vehicle.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103102D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |