VA HB212 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
MEI Project Approval Commission; board-level gender and diversity requirements. Requires the MEI Project Approval Commission to consider, prior to recommending approval of any major employment and investment (MEI) project, a board diversity disclosure statement submitted by the business seeking incentives. The Commission is required to consider (i) whether such statement specifies the number and percentage of diverse directors who identify as female or as representing a national, racial, ethnic, indigenous, or cultural minority in the country of the business's principal executive offices and (ii) whether the business commits to annually updating and submitting such statement.
Title
MEI Project Approval Commission; board-level gender and diversity requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB212ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (49-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Pekarsky, Lucas, Locke |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Watts, Maldonado, Coyner |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108734D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB212S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108734D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108734D-S1 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB212H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107353D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107353D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101407D |
Same As/Similar To
SB393 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day