VA HB201 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain transportation entities; membership. Requires, rather than permits, the four members of the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission, the two members of the Potomac and Rappahannock Transportation Commission, and the two members of the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority who are appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates to be members of the House of Delegates.
Title
Transportation entities, certain; membership.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB201ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB201H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106647D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Incorporates HB1173 and HB1175 (Sickles) |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106647D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2024-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101333D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |