VA HB1758 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Boards of zoning appeals; City of Portsmouth. Adds the City of Portsmouth to a provision requiring the governing body to appoint members and alternates to the board of zoning appeals. Under the general law, the circuit court appoints the members of a locality's board of zoning appeals.
Title
Portsmouth, City of; appointment of board of zoning appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1758ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (80-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102892D |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)