VA HB1447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Pass-through entity tax; penalty waiver. Directs the Department of Taxation to waive penalties imposed on any pass-through entity paying the pass-through entity income tax for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2021, but before January 1, 2024. The waiver shall not apply to any penalty imposed due to a false or fraudulent action by the taxpayer with the intention of evading the tax.
Title
Pass-through entity tax; penalty waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104635D |