VA HB1412 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Weighing exemptions for vehicles owned by a locality. Provides an exemption from weighing for vehicles owned by a locality when the locality maintains the highway or roadway adjacent to the weigh station. This bill would apply to the City of Suffolk.
Title
Vehicles owned by a locality; weighing exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Tabled in Transportation by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101946D |