VA HB1407 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Qualified voters; definition of violent felony. Defines the term "violent felony" to be used in determining a person's eligibility for restoration of his civil rights. The bill has an effective date of January 1, 2019, contingent upon voter approval of amendments to Article II, Section 1 and Article V, Section 12 of the Constitution of Virginia at the November 2018 general election.
Title
Voters, qualified; definition of violent felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-09-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-09-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100566D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1407 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1407+hil |