VA HB1403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dam Safety, Flood Prevention, and Protection Assistance Fund; percentage of funds available; owner match requirements.
Title
Dam Safety, Flood Prevention, and Protection Assistance Fund; percentage of funds available.
Sponsors
Del. Amy Laufer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107944D-S1 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105612D |
Same As/Similar To
HB259 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
SB698 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
SB698 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 603.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 606.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |