VA HB1357 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Automobile, commercial liability, and homeowners insurance policies; notices. Adds the option that insurers may use any first class mail tracking method that is used, or has been approved, by the U. S. Postal Service (USPS) to demonstrate proof that a cancellation or nonrenewal notice pertaining to a motor vehicle, commercial liability, or homeowners insurance policy was mailed to an insured. Other options include using registered or certified mail. Currently, insurers may use registered or certified mail, or obtain a certificate of mailing or certificate of bulk mailing from the USPS at the time of mailing, to prove a termination notice was mailed. The bill deletes provisions that refer to the certificate of mailing and certificate of bulk mailing options.
Title
Automobile and homeowners insurance policies; notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 443 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1357ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 30-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1357H1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103975D-H1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103975D-H1 |
2015-01-20 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101085D |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |